PROFESSIONALS FOR YEMEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the preservation of health among people living in Yemen by training professionals and increase capacity of health care facilities To advance the education of the public and professionals in Yemen on cancer and chronic diseases by providing training,information and advice. Increase collaboration between professionals in Yemen and those outside Yemen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Djibouti
- Yemen
Governance
- 13 February 2017: CIO registration
- 26 November 2024: Removed (Administrative dissolution under consideration)
- 26 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1197542 INTERNATIONAL NETWORK FOR TRAINING, EDUCATION AND ...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93 | £449 | £3.27k | £150 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 128 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN YEMEN. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PROFESSIONALS IN YEMEN ON CANCER AND CHRONIC DISEASES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AND UNDERGRADUATES IN YEMEN BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN YEMEN AND REFUGEE CAMPS IN DJIBOUTI BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND MEDICATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window