Trustees BUDE-STRATTON COMMUNITY PROJECT
Charity Number: 1172752

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HILARY WORKMAN | Chair | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Greener | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Collen | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Thorpe | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Harper | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS JAN HUNT | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Smith | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE HICKS | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Gray | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JEWELL | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DIXON | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.