Samaritans of Leatherhead, Epsom and Dorking

Charity number: 1170460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing emotional support for those in distress or despair by phone, email, text or face to face at the branch in Leatherhead. Outreach work includes talks to local community groups and schools, as well as supporting the Listener Scheme at HMP Downview.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,735
Total expenditure: £26,111

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SAMARITANS OF LEATHERHEAD AND MID-SURREY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Marilyn Hammick Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Gemma Grace Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Keith Valentine Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Christopher Duke Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Graeme Cooper Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Christopher Boon Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Susan Walsom Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Susan Fox Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Charlotte Dixon Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Jackie Tullett Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.46k £25.56k £32.31k £11.60k £16.74k
Total expenditure £47.91k £28.06k £17.82k £23.35k £26.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.17k £982 £2.77k £2.19k £2.19k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 01 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 MAY 1982 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN LEATHERHEAD & MID-SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2. TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
LEATHERHEAD AND SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 05 March 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE SAMARITANS
7 CHURCH ROAD
LEATHERHEAD
KT22 8AT
Phone:
01372376945