THE DEEP-SEA BIOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society enables the exchange of information on deep-sea biology through its membership program, digital communication platforms and the organisation and sponsorship of scientific meetings. We issue grants such as travel and career development awards. We give annual and triennial prizes recognising excellence in research. We conduct a mentoring program connecting senior and junior researchers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Chile
- Hong Kong
- New Zealand
- United States
Governance
- 06 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michelle Taylor | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Franck Lejzerowicz | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Erik Cordes | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alycia Jane Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Bigham | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bhavani Narayanaswamy | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Graca Aranha Carvalho Ramos | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neus Campanya-Llovet | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pierre Methou | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexis Weinnig | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheena Talma | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Sigwart | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ERIN EASTON | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.05k | £33.67k | £33.64k | £8.23k | £23.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.31k | £8.36k | £38.52k | £8.92k | £38.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jul 2017 as amended on 28 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DEEP-SEA BIOLOGY BY THE OPERATION OF A SCIENTIFIC SOCIETY TO PROMOTE THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION, THE PROMOTION AND DISSEMINATION OF DEEP-SEA RESEARCH, TO FOSTER THE NEXT GENERATION OF DEEP-SEA BIOLOGISTS AND TO PROMOTE DEMOGRAPHIC DIVERSITY IN THE STUDY OF DEEP-SEA BIOLOGY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Station Road
Polegate
BN26 6EA
- Phone:
- 02079425056
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window