PALACE THEATRE CLUB

Charity Number: 1175187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Palace Theatre Club is operated by a group of volunteers who raise money through trips and events for the Palace Theatre Westcliff on Sea, Essex.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £47,462
Total expenditure: £44,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANN WHITTINGTON Chair 07 February 2015
None on record
Carol Tutt Trustee 04 March 2023
None on record
Patricia Ayres Trustee 04 March 2023
None on record
Jan Pope Trustee 05 March 2022
None on record
THEO RAKUSEN Trustee 07 February 2015
None on record
PETER KNIGHT Trustee 07 February 2015
None on record
PRISCILLA MASON Trustee 07 February 2015
None on record
DIANA KEMP Trustee 07 February 2015
None on record
JANET Wallis FCILEX Trustee 09 March 2002
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.45k £14.02k £6.38k £47.46k £47.46k
Total expenditure £46.26k £15.46k £4.97k £40.55k £44.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 St. Vincents Road
Westcliff-on-Sea
SS0 7PP
Phone:
07785713215
Email:
No information available