PALLIATIVE CARE FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Palliative Care for People with Learning Disabilities Network exists to raise awareness of the palliative care needs of people with learning disabilities, to share and promote best practice, and to enhance collaboration between all services providers, health care professionals, paid care staff, family carers, carers with a learning disability and people with a learning disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 January 2017: CIO registration
- PCPLD NETWORK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Marie Marsden | Chair | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH NICKELS | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHOEBE MOONEY | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howe | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SWINDELLS | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valerie Anne Julia Potter | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jenkins | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna Elverson | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANNIE ELIZABETH STEWART | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr IRENE MATHILDA TUFFREY-WIJNE | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £13.39k | £7.60k | £768 | £1.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £10.48k | £8.43k | £5.09k | £6.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD DURING ILLNESS FOR WHICH PALLIATIVE CARE IS APPROPRIATE, OR WHO ARE EXPERIENCING THE DEATH OF SOMEONE CLOSE TO THEM, BY: 1. RAISING AWARENESS OF THE PALLIATIVE CARE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES 2. SHARING AND PROMOTING BEST PRACTICE 3. ENHANCING COLLABORATION BETWEEN ALL PROFESSIONALS, CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES 4. DOING OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS NECESSARY FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Greenbank Terrace
Hillside
SOUTH BRENT
Devon
TQ10 9AX
- Phone:
- 01364 641547
- Email:
- info@pcpld.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window