Financial history SRI SELVA VINAYAGAR TEMPLE

Charity number: 1171912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £332.27k £245.21k £358.49k £297.92k £397.86k
Total expenditure £244.44k £176.17k £295.06k £284.31k £337.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £61.69k N/A N/A N/A