SRI SELVA VINAYAGAR TEMPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Hindu religion for the benefit of the public in the London Borough of Redbridge . To encourage the organisation of educational and cultural events based both at the Temple and in the vicinity generally
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redbridge
Governance
- 06 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARMILA MURALITHARAN | Chair | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SRIMILA SRIHARI LLB | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SENATHIRAJAH KANDIAH SHARVASWARAN | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £332.27k | £245.21k | £358.49k | £297.92k | £397.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.44k | £176.17k | £295.06k | £284.31k | £337.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £61.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN REDBRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH MAINTAINING A SAIVA HINDU TEMPLE WHERE RITUALS ARE CONDUCTED WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON SAIVAM ACCORDING TO THE TRADITION OF TAMILNADU AND SRI LANKA, TO ENCOURAGE THE ORGANISATION OF EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL EVENTS BASED BOTH AT THE TEMPLE AND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THROUGH ORGANISING OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sri Selva Vinayagar Temple
299 Ley Street
ILFORD
IG1 4BN
- Phone:
- 02089118934
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window