THE COTTON TREE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps asylum seekers to tell their stories both for therapeutic purposes and to help them with their claims for the right to remain in the UK. It also gives them and other refugees legal and practical advice and representation in relation to asylum claims and appeals, and gives other practical help and advice and support in relation to their lives in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RUTH CIGMAN | Chair | 22 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Corin Alexei Etienne Menuge | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janice Ann Derry | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Favour Ahikire | Trustee | 08 February 2020 |
|
|||||
George Goldstein | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Mark | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.61k | £29.04k | £25.05k | £33.84k | £26.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.74k | £92.32k | £134.70k | £187.87k | £179.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
OBJECTS (1) IN THIS CLAUSE 'REFUGEES' MEANS PERSONS WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES SEEKING ASYLUM OR OTHER REFUGEE STATUS CONFERRING A LEGAL RIGHT TO REMAIN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THOSE GRANTED ASYLUM OR SUCH OTHER RIGHT TO REMAIN AND THE DEPENDANTS OF ANY OF THE ABOVE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES. (2) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST REFUGEES IN PARTICULAR BY (I) THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE, (II) PROVIDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION FOR THEM SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT TO LIFE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND BE ACCEPTED BY THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITY, AND SUCH TRAINING AND EDUCATION MAY INCLUDE IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH AND (III) DIRECTING REFUGEES TO OTHER SOURCES PROVIDING THE ADVICE, TRAINING AND EDUCATION REFERRED TO IN (I) AND (II) ABOVE. (B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF REFUGEES. (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES. (D) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR, ASSISTANCE WITH AND ADVICE ABOUT RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF REFUGEES WHO NEED SUCH FACILITIES, RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO DIRECT REFUGEES TO OTHER SOURCES PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES, ASSISTANCE AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR GARDENS WELFARE TRUST
6-9 MANOR GARDENS
LONDON
N7 6LA
- Phone:
- 02075030038
- Email:
- info@cottontreetrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window