Financial history CHILD GROWTH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £93.30k £105.33k £127.81k £87.80k £168.09k
Total expenditure £147.42k £113.79k £92.91k £107.29k £134.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A