PORTSMOUTH CITY COUNCIL ELEMENTARY EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in Portsmouth for those 12 or under
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 01 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan William Brent | Trustee | 25 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Terry Robin Norton | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Robert Gerald Van Cortlandt Vernon-Jackson CBE | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.04k | £65.99k | £86.43k | £56.98k | £52.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.78k | £82.47k | £97.78k | £109.28k | £68.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02 AUG 2013
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH: (1) THE PROVISION OF A SITE OR SITES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO AN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION OR EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS. (2) PROVIDING FOR ANY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEE AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION CONCERNED. (3) PROVIDING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR OR TOWARDS IMPROVEMENTS TO ANY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEE AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION CONCERNED. ASSISTANCE CAN ONLY BE PROVIDED IF THE IMPROVEMENTS ARE, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEE, NECESSARY TO EITHER: (A) RAISE THE STANDARD OF EDUCATION OF; OR (B) IMPROVE ACCESS TO THE EDUCATION BEING PROVIDED FOR, THE BENEFICIARIES AT THAT EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION; AND (C) THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION ARE NOT ABLE TO MEET THE COSTS IN FULL OR IN PART. (4) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (INCLUDING ASSISTANCE WITH THE COST OF EDUCATIONAL TRIPS), UNIFORMS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST THEM TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS). (5) SUBJECT TO CLAUSE (6) BELOW, THE TRUSTEES MUST PERMIT THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME TO BE USED IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECT DESCRIBED AT CLAUSE 4(1) OF THIS SCHEME, AND THIS MAY BE BY GRANTING A LEASE OF THAT LAND TO AN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION AT SUCH RENT (WHICH MAY BE ONE PEPPERCORN) AS MAY BE AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES. (6) THE TRUSTEES MUST PERMIT THE LAND NUMBERED 10 IN PART 2 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME TO BE USED AS A PLAYING FIELD IN CONNECTION WITH AN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR SO LONG AS IT IS REQUIRED FOR THAT PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PORTSMOUTH CITY COUNCIL
LEGAL SERVICES
CIVIC OFFICES
GUILDHALL SQUARE
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 2AL
- Phone:
- 02392688811
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window