DANESFIELD SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The school fund is used for: (a) the advancement of pupils' personal growth (b) improving school's facilities and equipment stock (c) pupil prizes at the end of the academic year (d) subsidising trips and events for pupils from low income families so that they may participate in both inside and out of school activities (e) trophies and medals in recognition of pupil success and achievement
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 25 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Armstrong | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.08k | £4.78k | £4.36k | £7.09k | £762 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05k | £2.28k | £4.90k | £4.31k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE SCHOOL FUND THE OBJECTS ARE THE SCHOOL FUND ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT DANESFIELD SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPLYING GOODS AND SERVICES FOR THEIR BENEFIT NOT REQUIRED TO BE SUPPLIED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. THE SCHOOL FUND WILL BE USED FOR:- A. ADVANCEMENT OF THE PUPILS' PERSONAL GROWTH B. IMPROVING THE SCHOOL'S FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT STOCK C. PUPIL PRIZES AT THE END OF THE ACADEMIC YEAR D. SUBSIDISING TRIPS AND EVENTS FOR PUPILS FROM LOW INCOME FAMILIES SO THAT THEY MAY PARTICIPATE IN BOTH INSIDE AND OUT OF SCHOOL ACTIVITIES. E. TROPHIES AND MEDAL IN RECOGNITION OF PUPIL SUCCESS AND ACHIEVEMENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
DANESFIELD SCHOOL
HENLEY ROAD
MEDMENHAM
MARLOW
SL7 2EW
- Phone:
- 01628483031
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window