UKHARVEST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKHarvest exists to prevent environmental damage by rescuing good food, preventing it going to landfill and feeding people in need. We help support communities ? working collaboratively with the charities we support by educating and providing great opportunities for economic and social well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,237,163
Donations and legacies | £442.53k | |
Charitable activities | £700.21k | |
Other trading activities | £58.59k | |
Investments | £35.83k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,510,074
Raising funds | £74.18k | |
Charitable activities | £1.44m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £532,919 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £74.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.44m |
People

33 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
516 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Christopher Ralston | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Stubbs | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Sim | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roma Carter | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Schwarz | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Reynolds-Viljoen | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Clare Day | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Cornell | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.47k | £1.12m | £1.22m | £1.30m | £1.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £328.08k | £617.03k | £986.28k | £1.22m | £1.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £78.89k | £74.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £172.23k | N/A | £531.49k | £532.92k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £998.52k | £873.06k | £375.00k | £442.53k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £22.30k | £58.59k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £116.49k | £343.31k | £889.90k | £700.21k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £419 | £679 | £8.58k | £35.83k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £8.37k | £468 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £608.75k | £973.37k | £1.22m | £1.44m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £8.29k | £12.91k | £0 | £74.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.55k | £13.29k | £4.74k | £4.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £235.85k | £242.69k | £228.72k | £180.34k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £464.11k | £714.08k | £931.40k | £803.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £34.15k | £59.72k | £184.24k | £280.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 DEC 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD AND THE RELIEF OF HUNGER IN PARTICULAR BY: A) TRANSPORTING AND DIRECTLY PROVIDING FOOD FROM INSTITUTIONS WITH EXCESS FOOD TO OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND AGENCIES WHOSE MISSION IS TO PROVIDE FOOD TO THOSE IN NEED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO FOOD SECURITY FOR THOSE IN POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT PREPARING NUTRITIOUS AND HEALTHY MEALS AND COOKING ON A BUDGET; AND C) BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uk Harvest
The Bricks
Manor Farm Barns
Selsey Road
Donnington
CHICHEST
- Phone:
- 01243696940
- Email:
- info@ukharvest.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window