Transform Iran

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates mainly in the Middle East, via partners, and among Christians who live in other parts of the world. Partner organizations are already established in the Middle East, as well as elsewhere in Europe. In addition other ministries operating as part of the Transform Iran family include: "Stichting 222 Ministry" in the Netherlands; 222 Ministries Germany ; Transform Iran in USA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Armenia
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Canada
- Denmark
- Finland
- Germany
- Greece
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 17 January 2017: CIO registration
- 29 October 2018: Funds received from 1095279 222 MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
- 222 Ministries International (Working name)
- Transform Iran (Working name)
- 222 MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDGAR ALLAN RICH | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID LISTER | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev LAZARUS YEGHNAZAR | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE THOMAS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
REV MAGGIE YEGHNAZAR | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.57k | £465.07k | £298.87k | £201.17k | £281.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.07k | £257.95k | £311.67k | £220.20k | £262.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2017 as amended on 17 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. THE INTENTION IS TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF GOD, PREACHING AND TEACHING THE WORD OF LORD JESUS CHRIST. (2) TO PROVIDE CHARITABLE SUPPORT AND RELIEF TO PEOPLE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD, AS THE TRUSTEES THINK APPROPRIATE, THROUGH GRANTS, SERVICES AND PERSONAL SUPPORT (3) TO FURTHER OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Frances Road
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG21 3DB
- Phone:
- 01276676520
- Email:
- info@transformiran.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window