HARBERTON CHURCH COMMUNITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and assist in the preservation, repair and improvement of the fabric (and its monuments, fixtures, fittings, furniture, ornaments and other chattels) of St. Andrew's Church Harberton for the benefit of the public and the promotion of stronger communities through fundraising and community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 11 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alicia Elizabeth Stolliday | Chair | 11 April 2017 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH HESTER FEARN | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Bruce Nicoll | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH MAHON | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ALEXANDER FOSTER WILLIAMS | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.90k | £5.21k | £6.27k | £7.91k | £8.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.94k | £3.52k | £9.44k | £6.06k | £11.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2017 as amended on 20 Jan 2022 as amended on 20 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC (AND ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS) OF ST ANDREW’S CHURCH, HARBERTON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE PROMOTION OF STRONGER COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COURTYARD
TRISTFORD HOUSE
HARBERTON
TOTNES
TQ9 7RZ
- Phone:
- 07977588527
- Email:
- harbertonccf@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window