CWMGORS SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The association provides Training facilities for Boxing and Training and playing Rugby also changing rooms and showering facilities for age groups from U7 to seniors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 22 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Davies | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM STEPHEN DAVIES | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £10.00k | £7.77k | £0 | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.40k | £2.24k | £3.19k | £2.74k | £5.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2024 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2024 | 277 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2024 | 641 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2024 | 641 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2024 | 1003 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2024 | 1003 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CWMGORS AND SURROUNDING AREAS PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN RUGBY AND BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Twynrefail Place
Gwaun Cae Gurwen
AMMANFORD
Dyfed
SA18 1HY
- Phone:
- 07883029577
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window