THE NIGHTINGALE FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Nightingale Fellowship is a grant making organisation. The Objects of the Charity are: 1 The relief of full members who are in need through financial hardship, distress or ill health; 2 The advancement of Education of eligible nurses and midwives whether in the United Kingdom or elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Elaine Smith | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valerie Jane Thurtle | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Frances Patten | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Bonham | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Arabella Wingfield | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Margaret Driver | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Shirley Walton | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Cecilia May Orchard | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jessica Streeting Mrs | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christine Mary Watson Taylor | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.85k | £79.87k | £129.34k | £123.85k | £82.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.12k | £134.55k | £388.77k | £88.64k | £100.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF FULL MEMBERS WHO ARE IN NEED THROUGH FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR ILL HEALTH; AND 3.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ELIGIBLE NURSES AND MIDWIVES WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE; AND 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES CONNECTED WITH NURSING AND/OR MIDWIFERY AND ALL OR ANY OF THE SCHOOLS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3.2 IN THESE ARTICLES CHARITABLE MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND / OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, THE SYSTEM OF LAW GOVERNING THE CONSTITUTION OF THE CHARITY IS THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 TRULL FARM BUILDINGS
TRULL
TETBURY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL8 8SQ
- Phone:
- 01285841908
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window