LADY LUMLEY'S SINNINGTON SCHOOL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity awards grants to Sinnington School, North Yorkshire following advice from the school's governing body.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 October 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRAIG MELVYN COOPER | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr JAMES SAMUEL COPPACK | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Joy Andrews | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Belinda Eade | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Clair Alison Foden | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
EMMA LOUISE STEADMAN | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY ACOMB | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £793 | £789 | £794 | £860 | £845 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 20 MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
1. IN PROVIDING, AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS OR MANAGERS, SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ANY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF SINNINGTON OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE SAME; 2. IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SINNINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roxby Hill
Pickering Road
Thornton-le-Dale
PICKERING
YO18 7LH
- Phone:
- 01751474271
- Email:
- clerk@llef.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window