Trustees BROMLEY AND ORPINGTON SAMARITANS
Charity number: 1170501

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Duthie-Smith | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Couper | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Collins | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Emily Pompei | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Joseph Sutton | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gita Bapat | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Sykes | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Charles Venables | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Anne Hughes | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ngoc Lan Vi | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Patricia Guy | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.