RAINY DAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve and assist persons in need who are or have been engaged in hardware/DIY, housewares, brushware, pottery, glass, builders merchants, ironmongery, garden supply, and all allied trades, and their dependants, in particular but not exclusively by providing advice, support and financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Drew | Chair | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Peter Barber | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Mudd | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Seema Bhogaita | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Morgan | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Field | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Willis | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Kincade | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Boyce | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Louise Garcia BA | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Frogley | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Avril Hicks | Trustee | 23 December 2016 |
|
|||||
DAVID HIBBERT | Trustee | 07 July 1997 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £272.06k | £226.96k | £289.20k | £286.98k | £392.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £534.82k | £342.76k | £302.38k | £359.91k | £375.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN HARDWARE/DIY, HOUSEWARES, BRUSHWARE, POTTERY, GLASS, BUILDERS MERCHANTS, IRONMONGERY, GARDEN SUPPLY, AND ALL ALLIED TRADES, AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 2) THE EXPRESSION "DEPENDANT" SHALL INCLUDE A SPOUSE, CIVIL PARTNER, COHABITEE, WIDOW, WIDOWER, CHILD (INCLUDING A FOSTER CHILD OR OTHER CHILD TREATED AS A CHILD OF THE FAMILY) OR ANY OTHER PERSON WHO IS OR WAS DEPENDENT EITHER WHOLLY OR PARTLY FOR HIS OR HER MAINTENANCE UPON A PERSON WHO IS OR HAS BEEN ENGAGED IN ANY OF THE TRADES LISTED IN SUB-CLAUSE (1) ABOVE OR ALLIED TRADES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rainy Day Trust
8 The Courtyard
Harris Business Park
Hanbury Road
Stoke Prior
BROMSGRO
- Phone:
- 01527872545
- Email:
- info@rainydaytrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window