MEDICAL ACTION MYANMAR UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support Medical Action Myanmar in its work to provide health services to poor people in Myanmar
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burma
Governance
- 01 March 2017: CIO registration
- MAM UK (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Slinger | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Barker | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joshua Cohen | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richenda Browne | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edmund Wilkins | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Molly Jakes | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Giles Middleton | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PENNY RICHARDS | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.43k | £137.50k | £143.27k | £80.65k | £74.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.30k | £112.55k | £135.62k | £93.94k | £87.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN MYANMAR (AND ANY OTHER REGIONS THE TRUSTEES MAY SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME), ARE: 1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH; AND 2) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 BARLOWS LANE
ANDOVER
SP10 2HA
- Phone:
- 07834408476
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window