CROSS MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cross Mission is a Christian mission charity to preach the gospel of Jesus Christ in every city and town in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JUNG HWAN LEE | Chair | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Pricilla Lee | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
KYUNG MIN LEE | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
NAM HEE LEE | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.69k | £4.18k | £7.08k | £7.83k | £6.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.56k | £2.85k | £6.19k | £6.75k | £5.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. INSPIRING, TRAINING AND EQUIPPING CHRISTIANS TO GO TO EVERY TOWN AND CITY TO PREACH THE GOSPEL IN FULFILLING THE GREAT COMMISSION OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST. B. PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY AND WORSHIP ON A DAILY BASIS C. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY THROUGH PRAYER AND BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2, Verulam Court
275 St Albans Road
Watford
WD24 5BJ
- Phone:
- 07541121675
- Email:
- crossmissionjesus@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window