SALTBURN VALLEYS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Saltburn Valleys CIO (Charitable Incorporated Organisation) promotes the conservation, protection and improvement of the land, gardens, woodlands, walkways, play areas, waterways, wildlife and natural environment, historic monuments and properties in the Saltburn Valleys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 30 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP THOMSON | Chair | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Stovell | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross Neil Weddell | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SPIGHT | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Sapphire-Star | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Burke | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PROCTOR | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Bladen | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sproxton | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY LYNN M.B.E | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £750 | £9.80k | £1.90k | £15.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.23k | £1.99k | £8.92k | £1.72k | £13.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £1.71k | £1.90k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Aug 2017 as amended on 26 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE SALTBURN VALLEYS TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE IN THE SALTBURN VALLYS IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THESE CLAUSES “SALTBURN VALLEYS” IS DEFINED AS THE AREAS OF OPEN SPACE AND WOODLANDS SITUATED IN AND AROUND SALTBURN- BY-THE- SEA, NORTH YORKSHIRE AND WHICH INCLUDE HAZEL GROVE, SALTBURN VALLEY GARDENS, SALTBURN GILL AND A SERIES OF ATTACHED WOODLANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SVCIO THE CONFERENCE CENTRE
Saltburn Learning Campus
Marske Mill Lane
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
TS12 1HJ
- Phone:
- 01287 623477
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window