Accounts and annual returns SHREE SWAMINARAYAN TEMPLE OLDHAM

Charity number: 509271
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 12 January 2023 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required