DEMA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DEMA FOUNDATION MAKES A POSITIVE IMPACT TO PEOPLE AND FAMILIES IN NEED WITHIN UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS. WE ARE COMMITTED TO WORKING CLOSELY WITH THOUSANDS OF COMMUNITIES AND FAMILIES ACROSS UK AND AFRICA THROUGH EDUCATION, TRAININGS, PROVISION OF ITEMS AND HEALTHCARE SUPPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Angola
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 23 January 2017: CIO registration
- DEMAF (Working name)
- DM FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DESTINO UKANI MAIALA | Chair | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alberto Paka Luemba | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSE D'ALMEIDA | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELISA LONGO ANDRE | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/04/2020 | 20/04/2021 | 20/04/2022 | 20/04/2023 | 20/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 April 2023 | 10 December 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 April 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2022 | 11 February 2025 | 722 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 April 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2021 | 11 February 2025 | 1087 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 April 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 398 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1538 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANGOLA AND THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO FAMILIES AND CHILDREN IN NEED AND/OR OTHER CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS CURRENTLY WORKING TO ALLEVIATE OR/AND PREVENT POVERTY; AND FURTHERMORE TO PREVENT OR ALLEVIATE POVERTY (OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO AND ANGOLA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTH CARE PROJECTS AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 CAVALIER GATE
LEEDS
LS9 0AJ
- Phone:
- 07759878190
- Email:
- admin@dm-foundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window