Financial history SOUTH WEST HERTS SAMARITANS

Charity Number: 1170559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.16k £46.30k £44.76k £35.31k £28.58k
Total expenditure £38.97k £34.16k £42.59k £34.14k £30.03k
Income from government contracts N/A £6.00k N/A N/A £8.33k
Income from government grants £7.70k £14.00k £15.07k £500 £500