WILDMILL YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide youth club for young people aged 7 -16 any younger children may attend with an adult. Wednesdays during term time we provide youth club sessions 4.30-6.30pm . This is usually arts/crafts/ free play, we have workshops, such as Affrican drumming, circus skills, bike maintenance or willow weaving. we open school holidays for 3 days , 2 weeks only for summer , closed at Christmas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
Total income includes £650 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
Governance
- 31 January 2018: CIO registration
- 28 February 2023: Funds received from 1186543 BRIDGEND AGAINST HOLIDAY HUNGER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBBIE Davies | Chair | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GRAHAM DURSTON | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE HAY | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL STEPHEN HAY | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAL MICHAEL RAYMOND STEVENSON | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.90k | £10.05k | £29 | £5.62k | £2.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.52k | £3.82k | £2.26k | £6.77k | £5.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £650 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 October 2019
(These accounts |
27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 8 TO 25 LIVING IN THE AREA OF WILDMILL BY: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 Bradfield Road
BRIDGEND
CF31 4HJ
- Phone:
- 07403346546
- Email:
- funky.fairy64@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window