PONTARDAWE HERITAGE AND VISITOR CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims are to advance the education of the public in matters relating to the history, natural environmental and social and cultural development of Pontardawe and the surrounding areas and of their inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £12,900 from 5 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 16 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN OWEN JONES | Chair | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Glenda Davies | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE ROSEMARY CARPENTER | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GODFREY FULLER | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|||||
MERYL JAYNE HUNT | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.60k | £18.08k | £9.65k | £18.00k | £18.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.19k | £17.83k | £24.71k | £9.10k | £9.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.44k | £17.91k | £6.14k | £12.90k | £12.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 May 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE HISTORY, NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT OF PONTARDAWE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND OF THEIR INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRYNAMLWG
GRAIG LLANGUICKE
YNYSMEUDWY
PONTARDAWE
SWANSEA
SA8 4PS
- Phone:
- 07546336563
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window