ONE BIG FAMILY - HELPING THE HOMELESS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to prevent or relieve the poverty of people who are homeless or in financial hardship by providing items, information and advice to individuals in need and or other charities and organisations who are also working to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £7,300 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 December 2016: Standard registration
- 24 May 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 May 2022: Funds transferred to 1195947 ONE BIG FAMILY - HELPING THE HOMELESS
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.23k | £39.36k | £59.26k | £118.69k | £58.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.57k | £28.97k | £37.22k | £58.13k | £38.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £26.92k | £7.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 27 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 27 June 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING ITEMS, INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/ OR OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WHO ARE ALSO WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window