ART HISTORY LINK-UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Art History Link-Up (AHLU) offers free-of-charge accredited Art History courses to state school students, taught in galleries, schools and online. Art History A level is taught in less than 1% of state schools. Yet we have taught over 600 young people from diverse backgrounds, from 300 state schools across the UK. Our students are transforming the sector and securing a vibrant future for the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 April 2017: CIO registration
- ART HISTORY FOR EVERYONE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tobias Matthew Rhet Monk | Chair | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rose Bridgett | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ngan jones | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Isobel Taylor | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Jammers | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Bloomfield | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Taymoor Atighetchi | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Lailaa Hakim | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.60k | £124.24k | £112.61k | £125.24k | £275.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.39k | £85.28k | £125.31k | £116.67k | £188.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROVIDE AND SUPPORT THE TEACHING OF ART HISTORY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 3.1.1 THE PROVISION OF TEACHING TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN FULL-TIME EDUCATION; AND/OR 3.1.2 THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, GUIDANCE, TRAINING AND CONSULTANCY TO EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS; AND/OR 3.1.3 NON-POLITICAL CAMPAIGNING THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN NATIONAL COMMITTEES AND WORKING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS; AND/OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD RECTORY
WIGGONHOLT
PULBOROUGH
RH20 2EL
- Phone:
- 07776235516
- Email:
- INFO@ARTHISTORYLINKUP.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window