Trustees ART HISTORY LINK-UP
Charity number: 1172792

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Anne Walsh Hooft Graafland | Chair | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Lavrentieva Yanakova | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Arthur Byng Nelson | Trustee | 19 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rose Bridgett | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ngan jones | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Bloomfield | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Taymoor Atighetchi | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Isobel Taylor | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Jammers | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Lailaa Hakim | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Matthew Rhet Monk | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.