Financial history The Plaister Charity

Charity Number: 1175106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.64m £211.85k £157.56k £160.57k £165.43k
Total expenditure £141.46k £191.38k £208.55k £172.03k £276.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.50m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £136.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £9.35k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £4.50m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £45.66k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £27.43k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £95.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A