Financial history DEMENTIA MATTERS IN POWYS

Charity number: 1172335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £226.26k £344.37k £126.65k £83.11k £117.72k
Total expenditure £212.78k £189.87k £203.01k £158.40k £138.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.60k £4.00k £65.14k N/A