DEMENTIA MATTERS IN POWYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the health and well being of peple living with a dementia or associated conditions, their relatives and carers in Powys through the provision of support, education and practical advice. Support the creation of dementia-friendly communities across Powys. To enable people with dementias to feel understood, valued and able to contribute to their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 30 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE HODGETTS | Chair | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Owen John Durbridge | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jonathan Michaels | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harold Proctor | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.26k | £344.37k | £126.65k | £83.11k | £117.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.78k | £189.87k | £203.01k | £158.40k | £138.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.60k | £4.00k | £65.14k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 30 MAR 2017 AMENDED ON 16 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA OR ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS, AND THEIR RELATIVES AND CARERS IN POWYS BY: A. THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE B. SUPPORTING THE CREATION OF DEMENTIA-FRIENDLY COMMUNITIES ACROSS POWYS C. WORKING TO ENABLE PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA OR ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS TO FEEL UNDERSTOOD, VALUED AND ABLE TO CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 105
Llandrindod Wells
Powys
LD1 9DA
- Phone:
- 07947647790
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window