PERFORMING ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit facilitating access to, promoting, maintaining, improving and advancing education, positive mental health and well being and recreation in the arts by giving everyone the chance to access creative music making workshops and events no matter what age, ability or background by running open-access music workshops and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 14 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN BATES | Chair | 09 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA AFFORD | Trustee | 09 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNIE MCGANN | Trustee | 09 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.92k | £119.72k | £77.93k | £86.88k | £85.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.91k | £79.06k | £108.46k | £111.73k | £83.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £900 | £41.50k | £30.54k | £8.50k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 14 DEC 2016 AMENDED ON 07 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FACILITATING ACCESS TO, PROMOTING, MAINTAINING, IMPROVING AND ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RECREATION IN THE ARTS BY GIVING EVERYONE THE CHANCE TO ACCESS CREATIVE MUSIC MAKING WORKSHOPS NO MATTER WHAT AGE, ABILITY OR BACKGROUND BY RUNNING OPEN-ACCESS MUSIC WORKSHOPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 GUILDHALL ROAD
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 1DP
- Phone:
- 07977351074
- Email:
- HELLO@PERFORMINGROOM.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window