Financial history ARTILLERY CENTRE OTHER FUNDS

Charity number: 1170834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £118.07k £41.88k £219.98k £99.87k £184.71k
Total expenditure £106.91k £51.19k £206.75k £140.70k £173.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A