Accounts and annual returns THE SOUTHOVER PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1175243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 July 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 31 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window