Financial history ASHFORD AND TENTERDEN SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1170627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.48k £16.43k £10.31k £21.72k £14.04k
Total expenditure £22.29k £9.46k £11.67k £23.91k £14.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k N/A N/A N/A