ASHFORD AND TENTERDEN SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1170627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To work for the assistance of persons who are suicidal, despairing or in distress by providing a service primarily intended for the benefit of persons in Ashford and Tenterden and the surrounding area to enable such persons to receive immediate help, compassion and befriending from members of the Charity selected and prepared for the purpose working in accordance with Samaritan procedure.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,040
Total expenditure: £14,069

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shazia Nasim Inayat Khan Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Susan Margaret McGeever B.Ed Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Catherine Jamieson Trustee 01 November 2024
STALISFIELD VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Darren Lawrence Archard Trustee 05 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.48k £16.43k £10.31k £21.72k £14.04k
Total expenditure £22.29k £9.46k £11.67k £23.91k £14.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/07/1972 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN ASHFORD AND TENTERDEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATION AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2. TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 21 August 1972 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
22 Queen Street
Ashford
Kent
TN23 1RG
Phone:
00
Website:

No information available