WATERSIDE FIJIAN METHODIST FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The furtherance of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Fiji
Governance
- 09 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIKI VAKALALABURE | Chair | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SERUPEPELI CAKAU | Trustee | 29 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LOATA KINI | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
LUKE VUETIBURETA | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev MANOA RATUBALAVU | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOELI SAVUTINI | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.21k | £13.47k | £15.70k | £12.04k | £9.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.41k | £7.14k | £14.54k | £14.68k | £14.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF GOD ABOUT HIS ONLY SON, JESUS CHRIST. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Tennyson Avenue
SWADLINCOTE
Derbyshire
DE11 0DT
- Phone:
- 07889006713
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window