THE INTERNATIONAL NETWORK OF BUSINESS AND MANAGEMENT JOURNAL EDITORS (INBAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INBAM workshops, conferences, seminars and international conference sessions in partnership with professional associations, publishers and universities. Editor guidance, education and support for young researchers in developing good articles for publication in top journals. Promotion of ethical publishing in business and management in association with the publishers of reputable academic journals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Guyana
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Panama
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 07 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor ADRIAN ZIDERMAN PhD | Chair | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor WILLIAM PAUL JONES PhD | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR BRUCE TRACEY | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor ROBERT BLACKBURN PHD | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £546 | |
|
Total expenditure | £271 | £376 | £293 | £451 | £933 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Feb 2017 as amended on 21 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST RESEARCHERS) ON THE SUBJECT OF PUBLISHING RESEARCH IN JOURNALS OF BUSINESS, MANAGEMENT AND ASSOCIATED SOCIAL SCIENCES, AND TO PROMOTE THAT RESEARCH WHERE POSSIBLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG RESEARCHERS, EARLY AND LATER CAREER ACADEMICS WHEREVER THEY MAY LIVE OR WORK, IN THE DEVELOPMENT, COMPOSITION AND PUBLISHING OF THEIR RESEARCH PAPERS IN REPUTABLE JOURNALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aneddfa
Bethel Lane
Penclawdd
SWANSEA
Wales
SA4 3FP
- Phone:
- 01962790607
- Email:
- admin@inbam-editors.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window