PINK CHAMPAGNE BREAST CANCER SURVIVORS' DRAGON BOAT TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to preserve and protect the physical and mental health of individuals who have had treatment for breast cancer by providing support and recreational activities and advancing the education of the public in the issues surrounding breast cancer. We do this by demonstrating the benefits of an active life style after treatment through the sport of Dragon Boat racing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 April 2017: CIO registration
- 21 September 2017: Funds received from 1127692 PINK CHAMPAGNE DRAGON BOAT TEAM
- PINK CHAMPAGNE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Mayhew | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Peevor | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angie Davies | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irene White | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Scovell | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Brooke | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary O'Sullivan | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.28k | £17.18k | £11.41k | £22.05k | £19.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.42k | £18.46k | £13.01k | £22.78k | £29.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE WHO HAVE HAD TREATMENT FOR BREAST CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN DRAGON BOAT RACING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HENGISTBURY HEAD CENTRE
OUTDOOR EDUCATION CENTRE
BROADWAY
SOUTHBOURNE
BOURNEMOUTH
BH6 4EN
- Phone:
- 01202425173
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window