Trustees SAMARITANS OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN, HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY
Charity number: 1170711

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Furqan | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Sarah Ann Ponton | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hughes | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Elizabeth Potts | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Sidat | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Houghton | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Clarke | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Fairbairn | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
The Samaritans of Blackburn with Darwen, Hyndburn and Ribble Valley | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.