Financial history GALBUR FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1173312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.74k £40.31k £28.30k £45.10k £78.72k
Total expenditure £29.84k £40.53k £34.51k £44.41k £49.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.43k N/A N/A £41.07k £71.36k