Financial history BAKEWELL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 509299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £12.65k £5.68k £10.55k £22.35k £18.97k
Total expenditure £15.42k £4.12k £13.72k £17.07k £20.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A