READING SAMARITANS

Charity Number: 1170632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides confidential emotional support, by telephone, text message, email or face to face, to those in distress or at risk of suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £60,309
Total expenditure: £52,345

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 February 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Scott Trustee 18 April 2025
None on record
Atul Khetarpal Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Sarah Jane Bowsher Trustee 10 November 2022
WAY WIDOWED AND YOUNG
Received: On time
Sophie Elisabeth McBean Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Hayes Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Hetal Patel Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Ester Margaret Malca May Trustee 31 August 2021
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Blanchard Trustee 31 August 2021
None on record
Justin John Henniker Bedingfeld Trustee 08 February 2021
APOPO UK
Received: On time
Darren Jones Trustee 07 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.89k £31.89k £59.42k £37.04k £60.31k
Total expenditure £33.11k £33.11k £45.90k £44.00k £52.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.57k £4.05k £26.52k £7.89k £4.18k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/11/1970 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/1985 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/1986 AS AMENDED ON 27/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN READING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
READING AND SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 15 February 1972 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
59a Cholmeley Road
Reading
Berkshire
RG1 3NB
Phone:
01189660903