Financial history BUTTERFLIES PRE-SCHOOL DIDCOT CIO

Charity Number: 1171056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £121.03k £106.77k £103.28k £117.63k £122.60k
Total expenditure £101.31k £106.98k £117.07k £131.44k £127.64k
Income from government contracts £121.03k £106.77k £103.28k £117.63k £122.60k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A