ANATOLIA CULTURE AND EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works to advance the Islamic faith in the Worcestershire area for the benefit of the public through the holding prayer meetings and public celebration of religious festival, in particular but not exclusively members of the Turkish community, in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £4,681 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 2017: CIO registration
- ANADOLIA CULTURE AND EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISMAIL TEKAGAC | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tevfik Ganidagli | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Omer Tekagac | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
HASAN CELIK | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.43k | £24.95k | £24.94k | £13.40k | £19.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.57k | £9.86k | £15.71k | £13.21k | £18.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.57k | £10.10k | N/A | £4.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 May 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN THE WORCESTERSHIRE AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. 2. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WORCESTERSHIRE AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE TURKISH COMMUNITY, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Middle Street
Worcester
WR1 1NQ
- Phone:
- 07715930127
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window