URBAN BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation for Bee Keepers to network and improve their skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 2017: CIO registration
- UBKA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY REITH | Chair | 10 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Gillian Broadhurst | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROGER NEIL MERRY | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275 | £498 | £215 | |
|
Total expenditure | £313 | £187 | £112 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 817 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 817 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1182 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1547 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING AND THE VALUE AND PRACTICE OF BEEKEEPING IN MAINTAINING A SUSTAINABLE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Kingsland Road
BIRKENHEAD
CH42 9NN
- Phone:
- 07877751418
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window