Financial history YUNUS EMRE ENSTITUSU

Charity number: 1171423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £365.57k £279.54k £355.46k £340.34k £406.35k
Total expenditure £421.45k £274.23k £341.84k £380.15k £385.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £68.53k £21.54k N/A N/A